Case: 05-92-02272-CR
05-92-02272-CR
09/24/1992
Assault or Attempted Murder
Paniagua, Eric A.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/29/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/29/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/29/1994 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/29/1994 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
01/12/1994 | Submission | | |
01/12/1994 | Submitted | | |
01/12/1994 | Submission | | |
01/12/1994 | Submitted | | |
12/27/1993 | Letter Filed | | |
12/17/1993 | MattConv | | |
08/02/1993 | Brief Filed | | |
08/02/1993 | Case ready to be set | | |
08/02/1993 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/22/1993 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/21/1993 | Response to Motion | | |
07/15/1993 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
06/29/1993 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/25/1993 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
05/21/1993 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/21/1993 | Response to Motion | | |
05/17/1993 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
04/20/1993 | Brief Filed | | |
04/12/1993 | Supplemental Transcript filed | | |
03/31/1993 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/24/1993 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
03/18/1993 | Mot Ext Time File Strans | | |
02/22/1993 | Transcript Filed | | |
12/31/1992 | Mot for Ext Transcript Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/28/1992 | Mot - Ext. to File Transcript | | |
12/14/1992 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
09/24/1992 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
09/18/1992 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
08/19/1992 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/29/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Dallas
Honorable John Creuzot
F92-40559-K
10 yrs TDC