judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Paniagua, Eric A. v. Texas, The State of

Case: 05-92-02271-CR
05-92-02271-CR
09/24/1992
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Paniagua, Eric A.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
06/29/1994Mandate Issued
06/29/1994Mandate Issued
04/29/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/29/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/12/1994Submission
01/12/1994Submitted
01/12/1994Submission
01/12/1994Submitted
12/27/1993Letter Filed
12/17/1993MattConv
08/02/1993Brief Filed
08/02/1993Case ready to be set
08/02/1993Case ready to be set
07/22/1993Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/21/1993Response to Motion
07/15/1993Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/29/1993Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/25/1993Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/21/1993Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/21/1993Response to Motion
05/17/1993Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/20/1993Brief Filed
03/31/1993Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/24/1993Mot Ext Time File Strans DispMotion or Writ Granted
03/24/1993Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/18/1993Mot Ext Time File Strans
03/17/1993Supplemental Transcript filed
02/22/1993Transcript Filed
12/31/1992Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/28/1992Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
12/14/1992Statement of Facts Filed
09/24/1992Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/18/1992Notice of Appeal Filed
08/19/1992Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/29/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Dallas
Honorable John Creuzot
F92-40558-K
65 yrs TDC