judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANIELS (AARON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44071
Short Caption:DANIELS (AARON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43995 , 44263 , 48318 , 52188 , 58238 , 62541 , 63578 , 64102 , 64193 , 67636
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C193728Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/16/2006How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/12/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/12/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-18932
11/08/2004Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement. 04-20463
11/15/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 04-20981
11/17/2004Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed November 15, 2004. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on November 8, 2004. 04-21087
11/17/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-20463
12/21/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment filed on October 11, 2004. Due Date: 10 days.
12/29/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of judgment of conviction filed in district court on October 11, 2004. 04-23671
01/04/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to Comply with NRAP 9(a). To date, appellant has failed to request transcripts in compliance with NRAP 9(a). Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to comply with NRAP 9. 05-00120
01/21/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. File Transcript Request. 05-01417
01/21/2005Transcript RequestReceived Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter Rene Salvaggio. 05-01419
01/21/2005Transcript RequestReceived Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter Tom Mercer. 05-01420
01/21/2005Transcript RequestReceived Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter Joann Orduna. 05-01421
01/31/2005Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed January 21, 2005. The clerk shall file the transcript request forms received on January 21, 2005. 05-01915
01/31/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: July 15, 2004. To Court Reporter: Rene Salvaggio. 05-01419
01/31/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: July 24, 2003; December 30, 2003; April 1, 2004; April 29, 2004; May 3, 2004, May 4, 2004; May 5, 2004; July 26, 2004; July 27, 2004, July 28, 2004; July 29, 2004; September 7, 2004. To Court Reporter: Tom D. Mercer. 05-01420
01/31/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: July 22, 2004. To Court Reporter: Joann Orduna. 05-01421
02/16/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix.
03/01/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 07/24/03, 12/30/03, 04/01/04, 04/29/04, 05/03/04, 05/04/04, 05/05/04, 07/26/04, 07/27/04, 07/28/04, 07/29/04, and 09/07/04. Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. 05-04021
03/02/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-04110
03/11/2005Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed March 2, 2005. Appellant shall have until March 31, 2005, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. 05-04876
03/16/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Appellant's Report on Court Reporter Transcript Filings. 05-05178
03/22/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 15, 2004. Court Reporter: Rene Silvaggio. 05-05574
04/04/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-06571
04/12/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Order to file Transcript and Granting Motion. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] Court reporter Joann Orduna shall have 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the requested transcript for July 22, 2004. If more time is needed, Ms. Orduna shall, within the same time period, file a motion requesting an extension. If the requested transcript cannot be produced, Ms. Orduna shall notify this court, in writing. Appellant shall have until April 29, 2005, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed with NRAP 31(a)(1). 05-07176
05/02/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-08622
05/13/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 7/22/04. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. 05-09416
05/20/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed May 2, 2005. Appellant shall have until June 6, 2005, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Counsel's caseload will not be deemed such a circumstance. 05-10044
06/20/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Third Motion for Enlargement of Time to file Opening Brief. 05-12112
07/05/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Fifth Request) 05-13186
08/08/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-15665
08/17/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motions and Directing the Filing of the Opening Brief. Appellant shall have until August 22, 2005, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Counsel's caseload will not be deemed such a circumstance. 05-16297
08/25/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Seventh Motion to Enlarge Time to file Opening Brief. 05-16879
08/29/2005BriefReceived Opening Brief. 05-17170
08/29/2005AppendixReceived Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 3. 05-17171
09/13/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Filing Opening Brief and Appendix. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received on August 29, 2005. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 05-18059
09/13/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. 05-17170
09/13/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 3. 05-17171
10/18/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. 05-20580
12/01/2005Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
12/09/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-24140
12/09/2005BriefReceived Reply Brief. 05-24141
12/13/2005Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on December 9, 2005. 05-24323
12/13/2005BriefFiled Reply Brief. 05-24141
02/16/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 06-03556
02/16/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/12/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Supplemental Briefing. Supplemental brief from appellant due: 30 days. The State shall have 30 days from the date of service of appellant's supplemental brief to filed and serve a supplemental answering brief. Upon the filing of the supplemental answering brief, this appeal shall again stand submitted for decision without oral argument unless otherwise ordered by this court. 06-09997
06/26/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's First Motion for Enlargement of the Time in which Appellant Must File His Supplemental Brief. 06-13190
07/03/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed June 26, 2006. Supplemental Brief due: July 15, 2006. 06-13731
07/31/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Second Motion for Enlargement of the Time in Which Appellant Must File His Supplemental Brief. 06-15914
08/03/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the supplemental opening brief and appendix received on July 31, 2006. Supplemental answering brief due: 30 days. 06-16077
08/03/2006BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief. 06-15916
08/03/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Appellant's Appendix Volume IV. 06-15919
08/03/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Supplement to Appellant's Second Motion for Enlargement of Time in Which Appellant Must File his Supplemental Brief. 06-16143
08/03/2006Other Other. Received Table of Contents and Table of Authorities to Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief. Attached to inside front cover of original and copies of brief.
09/07/2006BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief. 06-18498
09/27/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Clark County Clerk regarding the transmission of a supplement to the record for the jury trial proceedings conducted on 07/28/04.
10/03/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 28, 2004. Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. (Received from Clark County Clerk.) 06-20279
11/22/2006MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion for Order Granting Leave to file a Reply to Supplemental Answering Brief Late. 06-23955
11/29/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part, and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn18[Although this court directed supplemental briefing, we conclude that none of these matters are properly raised or warrant relief. We grant Daniels' motion to file a reply and direct the clerk to file the reply received on November 22, 2006.] SNP07M-MG/WM/MD 06-24387
11/29/2006BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Appellant's Reply to Supplemental Answring Brief. 06-23956
12/11/2006Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. 06-25275
12/26/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01/03/07 Order Recalling Remittitur.aa 06-25997
12/26/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/03/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Recalling Remittitur. On November 29, 2006, this court entered an order affirming in part and reversing in part the judgment of the district court and remanding to the district court for proceedings consistent with our order. Appellant filed a timely petition for rehearing on December 11, 2006. On December 26, 2006, this court inadvertently issued the remittitur. We hereby recall the remittitur previously issued in this appeal. 07-00220
01/04/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 29, 2006. 01/03/07 Order Recalling Remittitur.aa 06-25997
01/31/2007Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). SNP07-WM/MG/MD 07-02549
02/27/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-04350
02/27/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/05/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 1, 2007. 07-04350