judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMAS (AARON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44070
Short Caption:THOMAS (AARON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 49090 , 49857 , 57863
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C193886-1Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/12/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/12/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 04-18929
10/25/2004Other Returned Mail. Receipt for documents dated 10/12/04 addressed to Aaron Thomas remailed to corrected address.
11/01/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-20055
11/30/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-20501
11/30/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/06/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 2, 2004. 04-20501