Case: 18-1054
18-1054
11/05/2018
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
LONNIE D. CLARK AND TILL DAWN TATUM
KATHLEEN MOORE AND ROBERT BRYAN BURROWS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/20/2018 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Lonnie D. Clark and Till Dawn Tatum. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/25/2019 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
02/08/2019 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
01/08/2019 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
01/07/2019 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of Kathleen Moore and Bryan Burrows. | ||||||
12/20/2018 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Lonnie D. Clark and Till Dawn Tatum. | ||||||
11/06/2018 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted. Petition for Review is due December 19, 2018. |
| ||||
11/05/2018 | Electronic communication received from Party | Email received from respondents' counsel that respondents do not oppose the motion for extension of time. | | |||||
11/05/2018 | Electronic communication sent to Party | Email sent to respondents' counsel inquiring whether motion for extension of time to file petition for review is opposed. | | |||||
11/05/2018 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Lonnie D. Clark and Till Dawn Tatum. |
| |||||
11/05/2018 | Clerk's Record | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/25/2019 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Estate of Charlotte Dial Simms | Other interested party | Mr. Bradford L. Moore |
Moore, Kathleen | Respondent | Mr. Lawrence Matthew Doss |
Burrows, Robert Bryan | Respondent | Mr. Lawrence Matthew Doss |
Tatum, Till Dawn | Petitioner | Ms. Till Dawn Tatum |
Clark, Lonnie D. | Petitioner | Mr. Lonnie D. Clark |
Hunter, Roy | Other interested party | Mr. Lawrence P. Gwin |
Court of Appeals Information:
07-18-00067-CV
Affirmed
___ SW3d ___, 10-04-18
7th Court of Appeals
Honorable Brian P. Quinn
Trial Court Information
121st District Court
Terry
Honorable Jay Michael (Pat) Phelan
20,285