judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SORRENTINO VS. TOTH

Case Information: 44092
Short Caption:SORRENTINO VS. TOTHCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A471827
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A475012
Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/18/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Dino R. Sorrentino--check no. 3097.
10/18/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-19278
12/02/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-21981
12/28/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-22384
12/28/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/28/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 30, 2004. 04-22384