judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MMC, INC. VS. LABOR COMM'R

Case Information: 44091
Short Caption:MMC, INC. VS. LABOR COMM'RCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A459651Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/27/2004 / Paustian, KathleenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/18/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kirshman & Harris--check no. 8556. (Additional $50 due.)
10/18/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-19260
10/18/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. (Additional $50 due.) Due Date: 10 days
10/21/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. Additional $50.00 from Kirshamn & Harris - check no. 8577.
10/27/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/01/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 04-20003
11/08/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 04-20596
01/13/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 05-00826
01/13/2005Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 05-00827
01/21/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 05-01324
01/21/2005Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.