judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PEACOCK (BRIAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44057
Short Caption:PEACOCK (BRIAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 30411Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/07/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 04-18663
11/12/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-20820
11/12/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 04-20821
12/01/2004Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: December 9, 2004. 04-21827
12/09/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-22503
03/03/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP05-RR/MG/JH 05-04176
03/29/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-04690
03/29/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/01/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 30, 2005. 05-04690