judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MASTERS VS. GLEN LERNER & ASSOCIATES

Case Information: 44053
Short Caption:MASTERS VS. GLEN LERNER & ASSOCIATESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A457124Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee due. 01/21/05 Order-fn3: no supreme court filing fee is due.
10/07/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-18620
10/07/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
11/24/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Clark County Clerk requesting to supplement the record on apeal with a document entitled, "Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial Joined with her Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict or, Alternatively, for Reconsideration of the Decision & Judgment entered 7/13/04" filed on July 27, 2004.
11/29/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial Joined with her Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict or, Alternatively, for Reconsideration of the Decision & Judgment entered 7/13/04" filed on July 27, 2004 (submitted in response to letter issued on November 24, 2004). 04-21756
01/21/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Because appellant's October 4, 2004 notice of appeal was filed more than two months after notice of the judgment's entry was served, it was untimely and we lack jurisdiction over this appeal. 'We therefore dismiss it.' fn3[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant. On October 18, 2004, appellant submitted a copy of the district court's June 24, 2004 order granting her request to proceed in forma pauperis. Accordingly, no supreme court filing fee is due. SNP05-NB/RR/JH 05-01337
04/11/2005Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[NRAP 40(c).] SNP05-NB/RR/JH 05-07066
05/06/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-07185
05/06/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/16/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 9, 2005. 05-07185