Case Information: 34808 | |||
Short Caption: | WEBB (PHILIP) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - 7420 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/10/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
09/10/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 99-08544 | |
09/27/1999 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 3, 1999, at the of 9:10 a.m. and June 15, 1999, at the hour of 8:20 a.m. Court Reporter: Lisa M. Manley. | 99-09192 | |
10/08/1999 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 99-09748 | |
10/08/1999 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 99-09749 | |
10/18/1999 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 99-10083 | |
05/10/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-07739 | |
06/06/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-09496 | |
06/06/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/12/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 8, 2000. | 00-09496 |