judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHAEL HANNIFAN and KEVIN HAMPLEMAN v. THE AMERICAN NATIONAL BANK OF CHEYENNE, as Conservator of the Estate of LESLIE ROY "LES" BUTTS, DAVIS and DAWSON BUTTS, the minor children of Les Butts and Heather Butts, by their mother and natural guardian, Heather Butts

Case Heading (S-07-0156)
Case Number:S-07-0156Case Docketed On:07/16/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:MICHAEL HANNIFAN and KEVIN HAMPLEMAN v. THE AMERICAN NATIONAL BANK OF CHEYENNE, as Conservator of the Estate of LESLIE ROY "LES" BUTTS, DAVIS and DAWSON BUTTS, the minor children of Les Butts and Heather Butts, by their mother and natural guardian, Heather Butts
Full Title:MICHAEL HANNIFAN and KEVIN HAMPLEMAN, Appellants (Defendants), v. THE AMERICAN NATIONAL BANK OF CHEYENNE, as Conservator of the Estate of LESLIE ROY "LES" BUTTS, DAVIS and DAWSON BUTTS, the minor children of Les Butts and Heather Butts, by their mother and natural guardian, Heather Butts, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichael HannifanJoe Myron Teig
Paula Ann Fleck
Patrick J. Murphy
AppellantKevin HamplemanJoe Myron Teig
Paula Ann Fleck
Patrick J. Murphy
AppelleeThe American National Bank of CheyenneJames E. Fitzgerald
Michael D. Cok
Theodore R. Dunn
AppelleeDavis ButtsJames E. Fitzgerald
Michael D. Cok
Theodore R. Dunn
AppelleeDawson ButtsJames E. Fitzgerald
Michael D. Cok
Theodore R. Dunn

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Evidence, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 65
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/16/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/16/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/19/2007Notice-Internal - Other - Corrected captionNotice-InternalOtherFinal
08/06/2007Motion - Admission pro hac vice for Devi Yorty to appear on behalf of appellantsMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
08/06/2007Motion - Admission pro hac vice for Alan Epstein to appear on behalf of appellantsMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
08/07/2007Order - Pro hac vice - allowOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
08/07/2007Order - Pro hac vice - allowOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
08/15/2007Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance for Patrick J. Murphy to appear on behalf of appellantsNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
08/17/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantsMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/17/2007Response/Objection - Motion for extension of timeResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
08/17/2007Order - Grant - extension of time to file brief of appellantsOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/10/2007Motion - Admission pro hac vice - Michael D. CokMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
09/10/2007Motion - Admission pro hac vice - Theodore R. DunnMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
09/18/2007Order - Pro hac vice - allow - Michael D. CokOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
09/18/2007Order - Pro hac vice - allow - Theodore R. DunnOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
09/26/2007Correspondence - Incoming -copy of letter sent to District Court Clerk from counsel for appellants re return of recordCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
09/27/2007Brief - Appellants'; and received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
11/08/2007Brief - Appellees'; received copy of brief on cd; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
11/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/26/2007Brief - Appellants' reply; and received copy of brief on cd.BriefAppellant replyFinal
12/05/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, six volumes. Volumes I-III, original papers; Volumes IV-V, transcripts; Volume VI, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/07/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick Murphy and Joe Teig for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - James E. Fitzgerald for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/26/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - James Fitzgerald and Michael Cok for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/16/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Patrick J. Murphy and Joe Myron Teig, argument by Mr. Murphy for appellants; Michael D. Cok and James E. Fitzgerald for appellees) and taken under advisement.,EventOral argument presentedFinal
01/16/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/11/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the Court; Chief Justice Voigt filed a special concurrenceOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/27/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/27/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/27/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/02/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cards - record signed for 7/1/08 by Kayci Fuller.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal