judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LUCILLE GOINS V. HARRY M. KIMANI, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1011
Short Caption:LUCILLE GOINS V. HARRY M. KIMANI, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5229-09Filed Date:08/19/2010

Opening Event Date:08/19/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/03/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLucille Goins N
Samuel BaileyNY
AppelleeHarry M. Kimani N
Robert B. Wolinsky NN
Michael D. Mcgill NN
AppelleeFrederick Williams N
Michael D. Mcgill NN
Robert B. Wolinsky NN
AppelleeRudolph Williams N
Robert B. Wolinsky NN
Michael D. Mcgill NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/19/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/19/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY of Sanction (Emergency)
08/26/2010APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION to Motion to Stay
08/26/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION filed by co-defendant SHEGA TO JOIN APPEAL and Aplt Goins' Motion to Stay Sanction LW
08/31/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for LACK OF STANDING given that LUCILLE C. GOINS was not named as a party to the order which is the subject of this appeal. It is ****MORE*****
08/31/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTIONS FOR STAY and TO JOIN APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STAY ARE HEREBY HELD IN ABEYANCE pending further order of this court. (BY: ETW) lw
08/31/2010TMC - NOA - motion to stay - oppo - OTSC - motion to extend time to respond
09/20/2010APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to this Court's order to Show Cause
10/12/2010 ORDERED that APPEAL NO 10CV1011 IS HEREBY DISMISSED for lack of standing. It is *****MORE*****
10/12/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that appellant GOINS'S MOTIONS for EXTENSION OF TIME and FOR STAY filed in appeal NO 10CV1011 ARE DENIED AS MOOT. It is *****MORE*****
10/12/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT SHEGA INC.'S MOTION TO JOIN THE MOTION FOR STAY FILED IN APPEAL NO. 10CV1011 IS GRANTED and the MOTION shall be DEEMED FILED IN APPEAL NO. 10CV1089. It is *****MORE*****
10/12/2010DISMISSED
10/25/2010RECEIVED - a subsitution of counsel for Anne M. Smetak and enter appearance of Misty Thomas of the Washington Legal Clinic for the Homeless as counsel for the aples
11/03/2010MANDATE ISSUED in 10-CV-1011.
04/17/2014FiledArchived