judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BUDGET RENT-A-CAR SYSTEM VS. EMPLOYERS INS. CO. OF NEV.

Case Information: 44073
Short Caption:BUDGET RENT-A-CAR SYSTEM VS. EMPLOYERS INS. CO. OF NEV.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0300738AClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/22/2004 / King, PatrickSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/13/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP--check no. 1528.
10/13/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-18943
10/22/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick King. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/25/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-19704
11/03/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service of D/S on Settlement Judge Patrick King. 04-20271
01/25/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 05-01591
01/28/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 05-01828
02/28/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Stipulation and Order to Dismiss Appeal due to Appellee's Delay in Executing Settlement Documents. 05-03902
03/16/2005Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 05-05195
03/31/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). fn1[Appellant's February 28, 2005, motion for an extension of time is denied as moot.] SNP/CLK 05-06308
03/31/2005Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.