judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CPCI VS. CREATIVE MGMT. SERVICES

Case Information: 44068
Short Caption:CPCI VS. CREATIVE MGMT. SERVICESCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 51778
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A451435Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:DouglasCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/22/2004 / Roitman, HowardSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:10/10/2006 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:William S. Boyd School of Law - UNLV
Submission Date:10/10/2006How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/12/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of Cary L. Dictor--check no. 6752.
10/12/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-18897
10/18/2004OtherDisqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings.
10/22/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-19586
10/22/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Howard Roitman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/01/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Amended Docketing Statement with signature of local counsel. 04-20006
02/09/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 28, 2005. 05-02655
03/25/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. 05-05848
07/05/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 4, 2005. 05-13257
08/19/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 05-16503
08/23/2005Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 05-16690
09/14/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts.
09/23/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/30/04. To Court Reporter: Tessa Heishman. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. 05-18899
09/29/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 05-19403
10/24/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Law Offices of Cary L. Dictor. 05-21009
11/21/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. 05-22892
11/21/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 05-22893
12/19/2005MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 19, 2006. 05-24666
01/24/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. 06-01701
01/27/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. Respondent's Answering Brief. Attached to inside back cover of original and copies of brief. 06-02053
02/15/2006Order/Procedural Order. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] Transcript due: 20 days. If more time is needed, Ms. Heishman shall, within the same period, file a motion requesting an extension of time, or if the transcripts cannot be produced, notify the court in writing, of this fact. 06-03371
02/21/2006BriefFiled Reply Brief. 06-03709
03/02/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 30, 2004. Court Reporter: Tessa Heishman. 06-04699
08/29/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The Honorable Miriam Shearing, Senior Justice, is assigned to participate in the determination of this matter in the place of Justice Douglas and to hear the oral argument of this matter. 06-17906
08/29/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on October 10, 2006, at 10:30 a.m. (SNP07M-MG/WM/MS)
09/26/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
10/09/2006MotionFiled Motion. The Nevada Insurance Guaranty Association's Motion for Leave to File a Brief of an Amicus Curiae Post Oral Argument (filed via fax). 06-20665
10/10/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP07-MG/RP/MS.
10/11/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. NIGA shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve the amicus curiae brief. If deemed necessary, appellant may file and serve a brief in response to NIGA's amicus curiae brief within 14 days from service of the amicus curiae brief. 06-20805
10/12/2006MotionFiled Motion. The Nevada Insurance Guaranty Association's Motion for Leave to File a Brief of an Amicus Curiae Post Oral Argument (filed via fax on 10/8/06). 06-20665
10/26/2006BriefFiled Amicus Brief. Brief of the Nevada Insurance Guaranty Association as Amici Curiae. 06-21976
11/08/2006BriefFiled Reply Brief. Appellant's Reply to Brief of Amicus Curiae. 06-22797
01/12/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED and REMAND this matter for further proceedings consistent with this order." SNP07M-MG/RP/MS 07-00889
02/07/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-02407
02/07/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 12, 2007. 07-02407