judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOFFMAN VS. SALVATION ARMY

Case Information: 44067
Short Caption:HOFFMAN VS. SALVATION ARMYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A448196Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:DouglasCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/19/2004 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/24/2006How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/12/2004OtherDisqualification of Justice Douglas. Law firm of Hansen & Hansen.
10/12/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Hutchison & Steffen, Ltd.--check no. 3680.
10/12/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-18873
10/19/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/01/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 04-20026
11/10/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 04-20691
01/06/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 05-00322
01/18/2005Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 05-00973
01/31/2005Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Called for a corrected proof of service. 05-01952
01/31/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Hutchison & Steffen, LLC. Called for a corrected proof of service. 05-01953
01/31/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 7/22/04. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna 05-02000
02/11/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for Notice of Change of Address and Appellant's Certificate Re: Transcript of Proceedings. 05-02827
05/17/2005MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: June 17, 2005. 05-09542
06/21/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. 05-12141
06/21/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 4. 05-12142
07/18/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. 05-14268
08/18/2005BriefFiled Reply Brief. 05-16403
03/24/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 06-06262
03/24/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP06-WM/MG/JM.
07/12/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-14313
08/08/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-16245
08/08/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/17/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 10, 2006. 06-16245