judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEWART VS. STEWART C/W 39563

Case Information: 44064
Short Caption:STEWART VS. STEWART C/W 39563Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 39563 *, 44064Related Case(s): 34219 , 39563
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV9502299Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/11/2006How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/08/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Smith & Harmer, Ltd.--check no. 6453.
10/08/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-18760
10/12/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Documents. It has been determined that this appeal willl not be scheduled for settlement conference. Transcript request form due: 15 days. Opening Brief due: 120 days.
10/20/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-19402
10/20/2004Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 04-19403
02/04/2005MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: 03/11/05. 05-02271
03/11/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. 05-04930
03/11/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 05-04931
04/13/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Notice of Appearance and Substitution of Counsel. Ryan J. Earl in place and stead of David A. Hardy. 05-07263
04/13/2005MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 11, 2005. 05-07265
05/10/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. 05-09168
05/10/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 05-09169
06/08/2005MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: July 11, 2005. 05-11287
07/08/2005BriefFiled Reply Brief. 05-13557
07/14/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. Because these appeals arise from the same district court case, we conclude that judicial economy will be served by resolving the appeals together. These appeals are hereby consolidated. Nos. 39563/44064. (05-14041)
01/11/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled and these appeals shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. Nos. 39563/44064. (06-00779)
01/11/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP06-MD/NB/RP. Nos. 39563/44064
04/19/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. These are consolidated appeals. "We affirm the district court's orders." NNP06-MD/NB/RP. Nos. 39563/44064. 06-08332
05/16/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-08738
05/16/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/05/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 17, 2006. 06-08738