judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PIPKINS VS. UEUNTEN

Case Information: 44066
Short Caption:PIPKINS VS. UEUNTENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A489878Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/12/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
10/12/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-18872
10/12/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
10/21/2004Other Returned Mail. Receipt for documents and Notice to Pay Filing Fee (both dated 10/12/04) addressed to Richard L. Pipkins returned. No forwarding address.
10/27/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Clark County Clerk regarding transmission of documents (Order filed 09/01/04 and Notice of Entry of Order filed 09/08/04).
11/04/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Order filed in district court on September 1, 2004. 04-20337
11/04/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: September 8, 2004. 04-20339
11/09/2004Other Returned Mail. Letter issued 10/27/04 addressed to Richard Pipkins returned. No forwarding address.
11/29/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Payment of Filing Fee or Compliance with NRAP 24. We direct appellant to either pay the supreme court filing fee or file a proper supported motion in the district court for leave to proceed in forma pauperis within 20 days of the date of this order. If appellant files a district court motion, he shall inform this court in writing within the 20-day period. Failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of his appeal. 04-21656
12/07/2004Other Returned Mail. Order filed 11/29/04 addressed to Richard Pipkins returned. No forwarding address.
10/20/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Appellant has not responded to our filing fee order. "We dismiss this appeal as abandoned." NNP06R-MD/RR/RP 05-20780
11/03/2005Other Returned Mail. Order filed 10/20/05 addressed to Richard Pipkins returned. No forwarding address.
11/15/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-21700
11/15/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/28/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 22, 2005. 05-21700