judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TOMBOW (LESLIE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44065
Short Caption:TOMBOW (LESLIE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR041565Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/08/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/08/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 04-18766
10/14/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 4, 2004 and September 8, 2004. Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. 04-19076
10/15/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 08/04/04 and 09/08/04. Court Reporter: I. Zihn. Filed in district court on: 10/06/04. 04-19155
11/18/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-21314
11/18/2004AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 04-21315
12/09/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-22508
02/15/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP05-RR/MG/JH 05-02944
03/15/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-03310
03/15/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/01/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 17, 2005. 05-03310