judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-11391
A-11391
04/11/1966
Application for Writ of Error
N. BRUCE CALDER AND CURTIS E. CALDER, JR., DBA HORIZON OIL AND GAS COMPANY AND SUNAC PETROLEUM CORPORATION
FRANK PARKES
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/13/1967Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/19/1966Response to Brief filedPetitioner
10/17/1966Supplement to ResponseRespondent
05/30/1966Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/02/1966Response to PetitionRespondent
04/11/1966Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/16/1967Response to Motion filed
06/13/1967Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/31/1967Dissenting opinion issued.
05/31/1967Opinion issued
10/19/1966Response to Brief filed
10/17/1966Supplement to Response
07/13/1966Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1966Document received (See Remarks)
05/30/1966Reply to Response
05/02/1966Response to Petition
04/11/1966Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/11/1966Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Frank ParkesRespondent
N. Bruce Calder and Curtis E. Calder, Jr., dba Horizon Oil and Gas Company and Sunac Petroleum CorporationPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information