judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. DIST. CT. (HOGAN) (DEATH PENALTY)

Case Information: 44054
Short Caption:STATE VS. DIST. CT. (HOGAN) (DEATH PENALTY)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 46293
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C068560Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Certiorari/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/07/2004Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Petition for Writ of Prohibition or in the Alternative, Mandamus. 04-18621
10/07/2004AppendixFiled Appendix. Exhibits. 04-18622
11/15/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-20898
12/03/2004Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Petition for Rehearing or, in the Alternative, Motion for Remand to District Court for Clarification. 04-22097
12/21/2004Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-23251
01/18/2005RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 05-00350
01/18/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.