judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DORSEY (KENNETH) VS. STATE C/W 47949

Case Information: 47950
Short Caption:DORSEY (KENNETH) VS. STATE C/W 47949Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 47949 *, 47950Related Case(s): 40827 , 41987 , 44541
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR020676Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:HardestyCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/29/2006OtherDisqualification of Justice Hardesty. Sat in district court proceedings.
08/29/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/29/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17971
10/04/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. fn1[We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition.] "ORDER these appeals DISMISSED." SNP07M-MG/WM/MD. Nos. 47949/47950. 06-20355
10/31/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-21163
10/31/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/08/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 1, 2006. 06-21163