judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CARROW (DALE) VS. STATE (CIVIL)

Case Information: 44076
Short Caption:CARROW (DALE) VS. STATE (CIVIL)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0305529Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/20/2005How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/14/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee due. Motion to proceed in forma pauperis pending in district court.
10/14/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-19036
11/09/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Certified copy of case appeal statement submitted by proper person appellant filed in district court on November 4, 2004. 04-20649
11/15/2004Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed in district court on November 5, 2004. 04-20973
01/03/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Washoe Co. Clerk requesting the district court order filed September 20, 2004.
01/11/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Order Denying Petition filed 9/20/04 and Notice of Entry of Order filed 9/22/04. 05-00607
01/26/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No.CV0305529: 120 days. fn2[See NRAP 11(a)(2) (providing that the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.)] The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 05-01699
04/20/2005Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 05-07652
04/20/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/19/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that the district court did not abuse its discretion. "Order of Affirmance." NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-09887
06/13/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. In light of our May 19 order, we deny appellant's November 23, 2004 proper person motion as moot. 05-11508
07/06/2005Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to file the rehearing petition, which was provisionally received on June 6, 2005.] NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-13285
07/06/2005Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Petition for Rehearing En Banc or; in the Alternative Petition for Rehearing. 05-11034
07/13/2005Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Request for Formal Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. 09/16/05 Order-fn1: filed proper person request.jcr 05-13968
08/02/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-13507
08/02/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/12/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 3, 2005. 05-13507
09/16/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. for Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Appellant has submitted a "Request for Formal Finding of Fact and Conclusions of Law." fn1[We have considered the proper person documents received from appellant. We direct the court clerk to file the "Request."] This court does no make factual findings. We deny appellant's "request." 05-18441
09/16/2005Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Request for Formal Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. 05-13968
03/01/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The motion to direct the Clerk to file a petition for a writ of certiorari out of time is denied. 06-04637