judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8365
B-8365
04/02/1979
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF FORT WORTH, FIREMANS AND POLICEMENS CIVIL SERVICE COMMISSION OF THE CITY OF FORT WORTH, A. J. BROWN, CHIEF OF POLICE OF THE CITY OF FORT WORTH
B. G. BLANCHARD AND R. C. SUTHERLAND
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/22/1979Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/13/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
04/02/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/02/1979Response to Motion filed
06/22/1979Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/13/1979Document received (See Remarks)
06/13/1979Document received (See Remarks)
06/13/1979Opinion issued
06/13/1979Document received (See Remarks)
06/13/1979Document received (See Remarks)
04/13/1979Response to Petition
04/02/1979Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/02/1979Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
B. G. Blanchard and R. C. SutherlandRespondent
City of Fort Worth, Firemans and Policemens Civil Service Commission of the City of Fort Worth, A. J. Brown, Chief of Police of the City of Fort WorthPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information