judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BOUTEILLER (PAUL) VS. STATE C/W 44084

Case Information: 44083
Short Caption:BOUTEILLER (PAUL) VS. STATE C/W 44084Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:44083*, 44084 Related Case(s): 36741
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR000671Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/28/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/15/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/15/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-19136
11/02/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due in District Court Case No. CR00P0671: 60 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.) fn1[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] 04-20139
11/19/2004Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Copy of order filed in district court on November 17, 2004. 04-21398
12/28/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 6. 04-23591
12/28/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/03/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that Bouteiller is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP05-NB/RR/JH. Nos. 44083/ 44084 05-02242
04/19/2005Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). SNP05-NB/RR/JH. Nos. 44083/44084. 05-07597
05/17/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-07744
05/17/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/01/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 18, 2005. 05-07744