judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FHR CORPORATION VS. ELDORADO RESORTS

Case Information: 44030
Short Caption:FHR CORPORATION VS. ELDORADO RESORTSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0400951Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/14/2004 / Gang, LeonardSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/04/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Littler Mendelson--check no. 700067.
10/04/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-18336
10/14/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Leonard I. Gang. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/21/2004MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Appellant's Dismissal of Appeal. 04-19475
11/01/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On October 21, 2004, appellant filed a notice of withdrawal of appeal. Appellant's notice is treated as a motion for voluntary dismissal. Cause appearing, the motion is granted and "This appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 04-19996
11/01/2004Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.