judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SPITTLER VS. COLDWELL BANKER INCLINE VILLAGE

Case Information: 44029
Short Caption:SPITTLER VS. COLDWELL BANKER INCLINE VILLAGECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45366
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9804721Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/14/2004 / Gang, LeonardSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/04/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of Gordon M. Cowan--check no. 5794.
10/04/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-18323
10/14/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Leonard I. Gang. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/20/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 04-19364
10/25/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 04-19629
10/26/2004MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 04-19795
11/03/2004MotionFiled Response to Motion. 04-20276
12/23/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondents have filed a motion requesting this court to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. Appellant opposes the motion. We deny respondents' motion. This denial is without prejudice to respondents' right to renew the motion, if necessary, upon completion of settlement proceedings. 04-23398
03/01/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 25, 2005. 05-03993
03/23/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 26, 2005. 05-05672
04/27/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 05-08334
05/10/2005Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 05-09142
06/02/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Transcript Request. Due Date: 10 days.
06/15/2005Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Gordon M. Cowan advising that the parties have reached an amicable disposition of this appeal.
08/02/2005MotionFiled Motion. 05-15376
10/21/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed 8/2/05. The clerk shall remove Cowan as counsel for appellant. Appellant shall have 30 days to retain new counsel or inform this court that no counsel will be retained. Mr. Cowan submitted a letter stating that the parties have reached a settlement. fn1-[The clerk shall file that letter.] New counsel shall have 10 days from appearance to file a motion or stipulation to dismiss, or if appellant does not retain counsel, he shall inform this court whether the appeal should be dismissed. We vacate our order reinstating deadlines for transcript requests and briefs. Failure to comply may result in this appeal being dismissed as abandoned. 05-20866
10/21/2005Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Cowan received on 6/15/05 per 10/21/05 order. 05-11778
01/06/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Appellant has not complied with the order of October 21, 2005. "We dismiss this appeal." SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-00295
01/31/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-01332
01/31/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/02/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 7, 2006. 06-01332