judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-7791
B-7791
07/31/1978
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
RONALD D. WERNER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF TERI RENE WEINER
INTERNATIONAL HARVESTER COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/06/1978Post submission brief filedRespondent
10/30/1978Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
09/13/1978Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
09/13/1978Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/21/1979Dissenting opinion issued.
03/21/1979Opinion issued
11/06/1978Post submission brief filed
10/30/1978Supplemental Brief filed
09/13/1978Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
09/13/1978Exhibits in case/cause filed
08/14/1978Response to Motion filed
07/31/1978Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ronald D. Werner, individually and as Next Friend of Teri Rene WeinerRelator
International Harvester CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information