judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. ENGELSON (CORYANNE)

Case Information: 44049
Short Caption:STATE VS. ENGELSON (CORYANNE)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C167500Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other
Disqualifications:GibbonsCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:03/13/2006 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/13/2006How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/06/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/06/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 04-18554
10/07/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 08/11/04 (all pending motions). Court Reporter: Jo Anne Pierpont. Filed in district court on: 09/29/04. 04-18595
11/04/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 11, 2004. Court Reporter: Jo Anne B. Pierpont. 04-20331
11/08/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-20465
11/08/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 04-20466
11/29/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-21660
11/29/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 04-21661
01/31/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. This court has concluded that full briefing of this appeal is warranted. fn1[If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, that party must file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief. fn2[We note that certified transcripts were filed in this appeal. But should either counsel cite to transcripts not previously prepared, counsel shall file and serve a request for the necessary transcripts pursuant to NRAP 9(a). If the necessary transcripts have already been prepared and are on file in the district court, the parties may include such transcripts in a supplemental appendix without filing a transcript request form.] Thereafter, briefing shall proceed as set forth in NRAP 31. 05-01942
03/02/2005MotionFiled Motion. Counsel for Respondent's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record and Motion for an Extension of Thirty Days to File Answering Brief. 05-04140
03/04/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. 05-04342
04/18/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to Withdraw and Remanding for the Designation of New Counsel. Attorney Xavier Gonzales has moved to withdraw as counsel of record for respondent and also requests a 30-day extension of time to file the answering brief. Cause appearing, we grant the motion to withdraw. The clerk of this court shall remove Mr. Gonzales as counsel for respondent in this appeal. We remand this appeal for the limited purpose of securing counsel for respondent. If respondent is indigent, the district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to appoint counsel for respondent. If the district court determines that respondent is not indigent, the district court shall direct respondent to retain counsel and cause counsel to file a notice of appearance with the district court with the same time period. Within 5 days of the appointment or appearance of counsel, the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order or counsel's notice of appearance. Pending further order of this court, we suspend the briefing schedule in this appeal. fn2[In light of this order, appellant's request for an extension of time to file the opening brief is denied as moot.] 05-07442
05/13/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Marvin L. Longabaugh as counsel for respondent. 05-09422
05/20/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appointment of Counsel. Copy of minute order. Marvin Longabaugh appointed as counsel for appellant on 5/11/05. 05-10026
07/06/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Reinstating Briefing. On May 13, 2005, attorney Marvin L. Longabaugh filed a notice of appearance on behalf of respondent. On May 20, 2005, a copy of the district court minute order appointing Mr. Longabaugh as respondent's counsel for this appeal was filed. Accordingly, we hereby reinstate the briefing schedule set forth in our January 31, 2005, order. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. If deemed necessary, appellant shall have 30 days from service of the answering brief to file and serve a reply brief. See NRAP 31(a)(1); NRAP 28(c). 05-13366
07/26/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. 05-14843
07/26/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 05-14844
08/25/2005BriefFiled Reply Brief. 05-16904
01/20/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on March 13, 2006, at 11:00 a.m. (NNP06-MD/NB/RP)
02/27/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
03/13/2006OtherDisqualification of Justice Gibbons. Sat in prior proceedings.
03/13/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP06-MD/NB/RP
04/18/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-08148
05/16/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-08281
05/16/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/05/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 22, 2006. 06-08281