judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FEATHERBY VS. HUGHES

Case Information: 47911
Short Caption:FEATHERBY VS. HUGHESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A518694Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/01/2006 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/24/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Blalock & Qualey--check no. 74919.
08/24/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17617
09/01/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/25/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement.
10/05/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-20468
10/11/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 06-20799
10/23/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. 06-21796
10/23/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Recorder's Transcript Re: Defendant Hughes' Motion to Dismiss. 06-21802
12/11/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 06-25306
10/02/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 10 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 07-21737
11/05/2007MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dimiss Appeal with Prejudice. 07-24187
11/21/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. 07-25480
11/21/2007Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.