judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

O'BANNON VS. SALHANICK

Case Information: 47910
Short Caption:O'BANNON VS. SALHANICKCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A511406Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/06/2006 / Hoppe, CraigSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/24/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Marquis & Aurbach--check no. 81859.
08/24/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17614
09/06/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Craig A. Hoppe. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/08/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-18608
09/28/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-19920
12/08/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 06-25130
12/08/2006Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 06-25131
12/13/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 06-25494
12/13/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.