judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HAAG (STEVEN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47924
Short Caption:HAAG (STEVEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 57296 , 60277 , 69768 , 69768-COA , 80539
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR031520Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/12/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/28/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17833
09/08/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 06-18541
10/12/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 06-21019
10/12/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/11/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Supplemental Record (10/7/05 transcript): due: 35 days. 06-25229
01/02/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 10/07/05. Court Reporter: Joan Marie Dotson. In Response to Order filed 12/11/06. 07-00050
02/28/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn11[[We have reviewed all proper person documents, and conclude that no relief is warranted.] NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-04763
03/27/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-06708
03/27/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/05/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 30, 2007. 07-06708