judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-7776
B-7776
07/24/1978
MISC PETITION
PLAINS STATE BANK AND TY FIELD
WESTERN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, THOMAS J. GRIFFITH, ADMINISTRATOR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/16/1978Reply to ResponseRelator
08/04/1978Letter brief Relator
08/03/1978Appendix FiledRespondent
08/03/1978Response to PetitionRespondent
07/26/1978Brief on the MeritsRespondent
07/24/1978Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/16/1978Reply to Response
08/04/1978Letter brief
08/03/1978Appendix Filed
08/03/1978Response to Petition
07/26/1978Brief on the Merits
07/24/1978Exhibits in case/cause filed
07/24/1978Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusOverruled
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Western National Life Insurance CompanyRespondent
Plains State Bank and Ty FieldRelator
Thomas J. Griffith, AdministratorRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information