judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ACCREDITED SURETY & CASUALTY VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)

Case Information: 47913
Short Caption:ACCREDITED SURETY & CASUALTY VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 46529
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR030300Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:05/09/2007 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:05/09/2007How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/24/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of Mark Wray--check no. 5448.
08/24/2006Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 06-17639
08/24/2006AppendixFiled Appendix. Petitioner's Appendix. 06-17640
08/24/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Proof of service on district judge. Due Date: 10 days
08/30/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Petition for Writ of Mandate and Petitioner's Appendix served upon District Judge Elliott. 06-18057
09/12/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 06-18837
10/10/2006MotionFiled Stipulation. Extension of time (to answer petition). 06-20669
10/12/2006Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. Real party in interest shall have until October 19, 2006, to file and serve an answer to the writ of mandamus. 06-21049
10/20/2006Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. 06-21632
11/09/2006MotionFiled Motion. Request for Oral Argument or in the Alternative to File a Supplemental Brief. 06-23067
11/30/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for Oral Argument and to file a Reply. We direct the clerk to schedule this petition for a thirty-minute argument on the Northern Nevada Panel's next available oral argument calendar. Petitionr shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file a reply to real party in interest's answer. 06-24542
12/20/2006Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. Reply in Support of Writ Petition. 06-26111
03/20/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on May 9, 2007, at 1:30 p.m. (NNP07-RP/JH/NS) 07-06367
04/25/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 07-09183
05/09/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP07-RP/JH/NS
07/23/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. "ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS instructing the district court to set aside the forfeiture of Accredited's appearance bond number A25-0117591 in the amount of $20,000 and hold Accredited exonerated." NNP07-RP/JM/NS. 07-15963
07/23/2007WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Julia Vohl Islas for service upon Judge Steven P. Elliott. 07-15985
07/31/2007WritFiled Writ. Served on Judge Steven P. Elliott on July 30, 2007. 07-15985
08/17/2007RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 07-16492
08/17/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/23/2007MotionFiled Motion. 07-18732
08/30/2007MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation for Extension of Time (file Opposition.) 07-19178
09/06/2007Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. Opposition to Motion to Publish due: 9/12/07. 07-19642
09/12/2007MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Publish. 07-20168
09/26/2007Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter (pursuant to NRAP 27(a)), "Reply in Support of Motion to Publish Decision."
09/26/2007MotionFiled Motion. Request for Permission to Consider Reply or Withdrawal of Reply. 07-21304
12/13/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. to Publish. Fn1 [We grant petitioner's motion for permission to file a reply and have considered the reply attached to that motion.] 07-27071