judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

OUEILHE (GABRIEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47920
Short Caption:OUEILHE (GABRIEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR061326Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/28/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 06-17830
10/05/2006Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: October 16, 2006. 06-20409
10/18/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-21424
10/30/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Counsel for appellant shall have 30 days to file and serve either a motion to withdraw this appeal voluntarily or the fast track statement and appendix. 06-22047
12/01/2006MotionFiled Motion. Motion for an Additional Enlargment of Time in Which to File Either a Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal or the Fast Track Statement and Appendix. 06-24673
12/08/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed 12/1/06. Motion to Withdraw this appeal voluntarily or the fast track statement due: 30 days. 06-25174
12/13/2006MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. Nos. 47919/47920-cases are not consolidated. 06-25534
01/19/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. on December 13, 2006, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw this appeal voluntarily. Appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1[Because no remittitur will issue in this matter, the one-year period for filing of a post-conviction habeas corpus petition shall commence to run from the date of this order.] NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-01397
01/19/2007Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.