judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LILLIE (JOHNNY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47898
Short Caption:LILLIE (JOHNNY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C211037Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/23/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 06-17565
08/23/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 5/9/05; 6/29/05; 7/11/05; 7/13/05; 8/31/05; 5/10/06; 5/12/06; 5/16/06; 5/17/06; 5/18/06; and 7/18/06. Court Reporters: Angela Lee; Cheryl Gardner; Shawn Ott; Mary Beth Cook; Joann Orduna; Bill Nelson; Carlaya Lewis; and Rachelle Hamilton. Filed in district court on: August 18, 2006. 06-17566
09/06/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 7/13/05. Court Reporter: Shawn Ott. 06-18395
09/07/2006Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Rough Draft Transcript of 07/18/06 due from court recorder Rachelle Hamilton: September 19, 2006. 06-18452
09/07/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 5/16/06. Court Reporter: Bill Nelson. 06-18463
09/15/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 11, 2005. Court Reporter: Cheryl Gardner. 06-19079
09/18/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 5/17/06 (2) and 5/18/06. Court Reporter: Carlaya Lewis. 06-19220
10/02/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 06-20185
10/02/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 06-20186
10/16/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 06-21207
10/19/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 5/12/06. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. 06-21591
10/23/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 5/9/05, 6/29/05, and 8/31/05. Court Reporter: Angela Lee 06-21813
11/28/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn5[We note that there is a clerical error in the judgment of conviction. Lillie was convicted of battery with the use of a deadly weapon. Following this court's issuance of its remittitur, the district court shall correct this error in the judgment of conviction.] NNP07B-NB/JH/RP 06-24345
12/26/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-25986
12/26/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/04/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 29, 2006. 06-25986