judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-7795
B-7795
07/31/1978
Application for Writ of Error
DON H. RAYBOURN
EVANDER M. LEWIS, EDWIN M. JONES OIL COMPANY, AND 404 DEVELOPMENT COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/24/1978Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/10/1978Letter brief Petitioner
09/18/1978Letter brief Petitioner
08/17/1978Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/11/1978Response to PetitionRespondent
07/31/1978Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/24/1978Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/10/1978Letter brief
09/18/1978Letter brief
08/17/1978Reply to Response
08/11/1978Response to Petition
07/31/1978Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/31/1978Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Don H. RaybournPetitioner
Evander M. Lewis, Edwin M. Jones Oil Company, and 404 Development CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information