judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HIBBLER (KENNETH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47899
Short Caption:HIBBLER (KENNETH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C195057Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/10/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/23/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17567
09/08/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 06-18543
10/10/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 06-20692
10/10/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/26/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP07-MG/MD/MC. 07-16473
08/21/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-16566
08/21/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/28/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 23, 2007. 07-16566