judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEWMAN (JAMES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47916
Short Caption:NEWMAN (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C222950Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/25/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/25/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 06-17704
08/25/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 6/8/06 and 7/25/06. Court Reporters: Kiara Schmidt and Janie Olsen. Filed in district court on: August 22, 2006. 06-17705
09/07/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 6/8/06. Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt. 06-18492
09/13/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 9/13/06. Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. 06-18922
09/29/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 06-19981
09/29/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 06-19983
10/16/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 06-21206
12/06/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Vacating in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED IN PART AND VACATED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP07B-NB/JH/RP 06-24912
01/02/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-00019
01/02/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/12/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 8, 2007. 07-00019