judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MCCULLAH (DERRICK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47915
Short Caption:MCCULLAH (DERRICK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 54423
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C207880Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/25/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/25/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 06-17701
08/25/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 1/20/05, 3/17/05, 7/28/05, 1/5/06, 2/21/06, 3/2/06, 3/7/06, 5/25/06, 5/26/06, 5/30/06, 5/31/06, 7/6/06 and 7/26/06. Court Reporters: Janie Olsen, Richard Kangas, JoAnn Orduna, Jackie Nelson, Paula Walsh and Bill Nelson. Filed in district court on: August 22, 2006. 06-17702
09/13/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 6, 2006. Court Reporter: Paula Walsh. 06-18872
09/13/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Tuesday, May 30, 2006; Wednesday, May 31, 2006. Court Reporter:Jackie Nelson. Proceedings: Wednesday, July 26, 2006. Court Reporter: Bill Nelson. 06-18883
09/14/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 1/20/05; 3/17/05; 7/28/05; 1/5/06; and 2/21/06. Court Reporters: Janie Olsen and Richard L. Kangas. 06-18971
09/14/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 3/2/06; 3/7/06; and 5/25/06. Court Reporter: Janie Olsen and Richard L. Kangas. 06-18972
10/02/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-20143
10/09/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed October 2, 2006. Court reporter or recorder JoAnn Orduna shall file the requested transcripts within 10 days. Fast track statement and appendix due: 20 days from the filing of the transcripts. 06-20620
10/19/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 05/26/06. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. 06-21592
11/15/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-23403
11/20/2006Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the fast track statement and appendix received on November 15, 2006. Fast track response due: 20 days. 06-23691
11/20/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 06-23404
11/20/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 06-23405
12/08/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 06-25115
12/08/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 06-25116
03/27/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD 08-07564
04/22/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-08107
04/22/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/29/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 24, 2008. 08-08107