judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHARTIER (JOHN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47908
Short Caption:CHARTIER (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 47042 , 48015 , 56725 , 61910 , 76936 , 76936-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C212954Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/09/2008 at 9:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/09/2008How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/24/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/24/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17596
08/24/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
08/25/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. 06-17699
09/05/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-18277
09/05/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/15/06. To Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. 06-18278
09/05/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/01/06 and 05/25/06. To Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 06-18280
09/21/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/12/06, 06/13/06, 06/14/06, 06/15/06, 06/16/06, and 06/19/06. To Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 06-19446
09/21/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/14/06. To Court Reporter: Bill Nelson. 06-19449
09/21/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/09/06. To Court Reporter: Renee Vincent. 06-19452
09/21/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/20/06. To Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. 06-19453
09/25/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Transcript Request: 6/14/06. To Court Reporter: Bill Nelson. 06-19596
09/26/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request. Transcripts requested: 6/20/06. To Court Reporter: Joann Orduna. 06-19687
09/26/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request. Transcripts requested: 6/12/06; 6/13/06; 6/14/06; 6/15/06; 6/16/06; and 6/19/06. To Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 06-19688
09/26/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request. Transcripts requested: 8/9/06. To Court Reporter: Renee Vincent. 06-19689
09/26/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request. Transcripts requested: 6/14/06. To Court Reporter: Bill Nelson. 06-19690
10/19/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 6/20/06. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. 06-21595
11/15/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (Amended) Transcripts requested: 5/1/06 and 5/25/06. To Court Reporters: Renee Silvaggio and JoAnn Orduna. 06-23432
12/11/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-25266
12/13/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 25, 2006. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. 06-25541
12/22/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: May 1, 2006. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 06-26275
01/03/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Order to file Transcripts and Granting Motion for extension of time to file Opening Brief. No court reporters are required to file transcripts for the proceedings conducted on June 12-16, 2006, and June 19, 2006. Transcripts due: 20 days. If more time is needed, Ms. Orduna and Ms. Vincent shall within the same time period, file a motion for an extension or if the transcripts cannot be produced, they shall notify this court, in writing of this fact. Opening brief and appendix due: 50 days. 07-00106
02/15/2007MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 56 Page Opening Brief. 07-03760
02/15/2007BriefReceived Opening Brief. 07-03761
02/15/2007AppendixReceived Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 4. 07-03762
03/23/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. and Directing Court Reporter to file Transcript. The clerk shall file the 56-page opening brief and appendix received on February 15, 2007. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant has included a copy of the transcript conducted on August 9, 2006, in the appendix to the opening brief. We elect to consider the Transcript filed in the appendix, and waive the requirement for Ms. Vincent to file a certified copy of the transcript with this court. Ms. Orduna shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file the March 15, 2006, transcript in this court. Failure to comply with our order may result in the imposition of sanctions. 07-06633
03/23/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief. 07-03761
03/23/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 4. 07-03762
04/20/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: March 15, 2006. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. 07-08915
04/25/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. 07-09196
05/17/2007BriefFiled Reply Brief. 07-10955
08/15/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change in Status of Counsel for Appellant. (Effective 8/27/07 JoNell Thomas joins the office of Special Public Defender and will retain her appointment as attorney of record for appellant.) 07-18036
12/03/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on January 9, 2008 at 9:30 a.m. (NNP08-WM/MC/NS) 07-25964
12/12/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. JoNell Thomas retains her appointment as attorney of record for appellant. 07-26996
12/26/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 07-28045
01/09/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. WM/MC/MS.
09/11/2008Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed/Remanded." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Per Curiam. Majority: Gibbons/Maupin/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Saitta. Concurrence: Cherry. 124 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 66. EN BANC. 08-23442
10/07/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-23873
10/07/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/22/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 9, 2008. 08-23873
12/15/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Publishers re: corrections in recently filed opinions. 08-31858