judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PRESNO (ALBERTO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47901
Short Caption:PRESNO (ALBERTO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C219826Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/24/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/24/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 06-17570
08/24/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 03/08/06, 05/15/06, 05/17/06, 05/23/06, and 07/05/06. Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt and Sonia Riley-Bennett. Filed in district court on: 08/18/06. 06-17571
08/29/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 05/15/06, 05/17/06, 05/23/06, and 07/05/06. Court Reporter: Sonia Riley. 06-17913
08/29/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 3/8/06. Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt. 06-17926
10/06/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 06-20516
10/06/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 06-20517
10/30/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 06-22063
12/21/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP07M-MG/WM/MD 06-26163
01/16/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-00930
01/16/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/22/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 18, 2007. 07-00930