Case: 11-17-00205-CV
11-17-00205-CV
07/31/2017
Miscellaneous/other civil
In the interest of J.R.G., a child
No
www.11thcoa.courts.state.tx.us
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/27/2017 | Reply brief filed | Pro Se |
| ||
12/04/2017 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||
11/06/2017 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Pro Se |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/20/2018 | Case stored | | |||||||
09/20/2018 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
07/12/2018 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
01/04/2018 | Submitted | | |||||||
12/27/2017 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||||
12/05/2017 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||||
12/04/2017 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
12/04/2017 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
11/06/2017 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
10/05/2017 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
08/21/2017 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||
08/16/2017 | Telephone call received | | |||||||
08/14/2017 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
07/31/2017 | Case Information Sheet from trial court clerk filed |
| |||||||
07/31/2017 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
07/31/2017 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||||
06/26/2017 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | | |||||||
06/21/2017 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/20/2018 | Case Stored | Case stored |
09/20/2024 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Office of Attorney General | Unknown | Adeola Shoyombo |
Gnade, Kim M. | Appellant | Kim M. Gnade |
Gnade, Aaron | Appellee | Lane Haygood |
Trial Court Information
318th District Court
Midland
Honorable David W. Lindemood, Judge
FM-53,519
Laquita Dettman, Court Reporter (Retired)