judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ADAMS (MELVIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44046
Short Caption:ADAMS (MELVIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 42089
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C149621Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/06/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/06/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/06/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-18542
10/22/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of the record on appeal due: 60 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings). fn2[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] 04-19567
11/15/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Order Denying Defendant's Writ of Habeas Corpus filed in district court on 11/8/04. 04-20894
12/06/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. 04-22222
12/06/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/07/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that Adams is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-00371
02/01/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-01056
02/01/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/07/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 4, 2005. 05-01056