judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BERTHOT (JEFFERY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47925
Short Caption:BERTHOT (JEFFERY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR052940Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/28/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 06-17836
10/03/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 6/30/06 and 7/18/06. Court Reporter: Denise Phipps. 06-20262
10/31/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. Appellant's counsel Michael V. Roth shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of the date of this order or show cause why Roth should not be sanctioned. 06-22179
11/14/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 06-23292
11/14/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 06-23293
12/04/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 06-24739
12/04/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 06-24740
01/10/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Vacating in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED IN PART AND VACATED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court with instructions to enter a corrected judgment of conviction." SNP07-MG/MD/MC 07-00696
02/07/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-02367
02/07/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 8, 2007. 07-02367