judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BREWER (RANDALL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47926
Short Caption:BREWER (RANDALL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37046 , 44233 , 50226 , 50695
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR001650Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:HardestyCase Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/23/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/28/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17840
09/08/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 06-18542
10/23/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. 06-21770
10/23/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/06/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn6[We have reviewed all proper person documents, and conclude that no relief is warranted.] NNP07B-RR/NB/RP 06-24887
01/16/2007Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1-[We have received appellant's "Motion to Strike Petition for Rehearing and for Leave to File Amended Petition for Rehearing." No good cause appearing, we deny appellant's motion.] fn2- [The Hon. Robert E. Rose, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment entered January 10, 2007.] 07-01003
02/13/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-02977
02/13/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/En Banc Reconsideration Pending.
02/21/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 15, 2007. 07-02977
03/01/2007Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. fn1[We grant appellant's motion for an extension of time. The clerk shall file the petition received on February 13, 2007.] NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn2[The Honorable James W. Hardesty, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC 07-04916
03/01/2007Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. 07-03531