judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HARRY CHARLES LANGELAN V. EVA KODULA

Case Information: 10-CV-1009
Short Caption:HARRY CHARLES LANGELAN V. EVA KODULAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB548-09Filed Date:08/10/2010

Opening Event Date:08/10/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/07/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/07/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHarry Charles Langelan NPro SeN
AppelleeEva Kodula N
Stuart L. Lipshutz NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/10/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/26/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 10, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index on accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
09/07/2010RECORD INDEX
09/07/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/17/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
11/01/2010 On consideration of this court's order of September 17, 2010, directing appellant to file the brief and the appendix within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
12/17/2010 On consideration of this court's order of November 1, 2010, directing appellant to submit the brief and appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
12/17/2010DISMISSED
01/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED