judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INS. CO. VS. STATE

Case Information: 34804
Short Caption:INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INS. CO. VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C139219Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/17/1999 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/10/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08532
09/14/1999MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal or in the Alternative to Post a Bond. 99-08636
09/16/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
09/17/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/17/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Wadhams & Akridge P.C.--check no. 2715.
09/22/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We have considered appellant's motion for a stay pending appeal, or in the alternative, motion to post a bond. We deny appellant's motion. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-09021
09/24/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. State's Response to Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. 99-09108
03/01/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-03227
03/01/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due Date: 15 days
03/09/2000Filing Fee Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 5358 returned to Wadhams & Akridge, P.C. with letter. (Notice to submit filing fee was mailed to them in error on 3/1/00.)
03/13/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-03869
03/27/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/03/99. To Court Reporter: Janice Liston. 00-04810
03/27/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/10/99. To Court Reporter: Yvonne Valentin. 00-04812
03/30/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 9/3/99. Court Reporter: Janice R. Liston. 00-05115
03/31/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-05235
03/31/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Notice of Previously Prepared Transcript. 00-05263
04/28/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal 00-06978
05/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to the motion for voluntary dismissal filed on April 28, 2000, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NNP/CLK 00-07926
05/12/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.