judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERT L. CUMMINGS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0152)
Case Number:S-07-0152Case Docketed On:07/12/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Crook CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Certified Question - State District Court
Short Title:ROBERT L. CUMMINGS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ROBERT L. CUMMINGS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobert L. CummingsNicholas H. Carter
Julie Nye Tiedeken
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/12/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/12/2007Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order certifying question Rule 11Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder certifying question Rule 11Final
07/31/2007Order - Certified Question - Declining questionsOrderCertified Question - Declining questionsFinal
07/31/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/13/2007Event - Phone Call - Received email from clerk of district court regarding whether or not a docket fee was necessary. It was mistakenly docketed without the fee. Contacted counsel for appellant's office and requested docket fee.EventPhone CallFinal
08/27/2007Event - Phone Call. Spoke with Julie Tiedeken regarding filing fee. She was told that someone needed to pay the filing fee.EventPhone CallFinal
09/18/2007Event - Phone Call from counsel for appellant re docket fee. She called the Judge's office and left message regarding payment and has not received a response. She will write a letter and copy opposing counselEventPhone CallFinal
09/20/2007Correspondence - Incoming from counsel for appellant. Received copy of letter sent to Judge Perry regarding payment of docket feeCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
10/01/2007Event - Phone Call - contacted Judge Perry regarding docket fee - he will revise order and designate who pays.EventPhone CallFinal
11/09/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal