judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEV. BUS. SERVICES VS. LOCAL GOV'T EMPLOYEE-MGMT RELATIONS BD.

Case Information: 47902
Short Caption:NEV. BUS. SERVICES VS. LOCAL GOV'T EMPLOYEE-MGMT RELATIONS BD.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44466
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A450617
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A450698
Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/01/2006 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/24/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/24/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17574
08/31/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/31/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) 06-18096
09/01/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/11/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant City of Las Vegas. 06-18707
09/13/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference has been scheduled. 06-18885
09/18/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellants/Cross-Respondents NV Business Services, So. NV Workforce Invest. Bd., So. NV Job Training Bd., & So. NV Chief Elected Official Consortiums. 06-19129
10/17/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 19, 2007. 06-21293
01/17/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 1, 2007. 07-01233
02/12/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. Settlement Judge requests a 90 day extension. 07-03474
03/02/2007Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The settlement judge shall file a final settlement conference status report within 90 days from the date of this order. 07-05040
04/06/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 07-07726
04/23/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 07-08997
05/09/2007Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 07-10272
05/15/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 07-10743
05/15/2007Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.