judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GUTIERREZ (ANGEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44047
Short Caption:GUTIERREZ (ANGEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C170227Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/10/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/06/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/06/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-18544
10/21/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.) fn1[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] 04-19519
11/10/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 04-20759
11/10/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/02/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP04D-RR/WM/MD 04-21984
12/28/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-22383
12/28/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/28/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 30, 2004. 04-22383